Axis Surplus Insurance Company v. Oasis Trading, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Defendant: Arkansas Economic Development Commission, Webster Business Credit Corp, Parkway Bank, Bradley Lumber Company, Oasis Trading, LLC and Arkansas Development Finance Authority
Cross_defendant: Parkway Bank, Webster Business Credit Corp and Arkansas Development Finance Authority
Cross_claimant: Bradley Lumber Company and Oasis Trading, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv01028
Filed: April 22, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Bradley
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2012 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY FUNDS as reflected by previous orders of the Court. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 30, 2012. (cnn)
March 27, 2012 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 137 Motion for Settlement; Clerk is directed to disburse funds from the Registry of the Court pursuant to the Settlement Agreement 138 ; Case Dismissed. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 27, 2012. (cnn)
March 21, 2012 132 Opinion or Order of the Court MEORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER finding as moot 58 Motion for Disbursement of Funds; granting 66 Motion for Summary Judgment, the sum of $1,451,000.00 shall be disbursed to ADFA from the registry of the Court; denying 71 Motion for Partial Sum mary Judgment; granting 88 Motion for Settlement, the Clerk of Court is directed to disburse the sum of $1,100,000.00 from the registry of the Court to the Trustee designated in the Settlement Agreement found in 81 ; denying 94 Motion to Se t Aside Order for leave or in the alternative Motion to Dismiss; denying 99 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 106 Motion to Strike Supplemental Response; defendants Arkansas Development Finance Authority and Parkway Bank claims are dismissed with prejudice from this lawsuit. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 21, 2012. (cnn)
July 6, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Discharge from Interpleader Action; Axis Surplus Insurance Company is dismissed from this action. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 6, 2011. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axis Surplus Insurance Company v. Oasis Trading, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Parkway Bank
Represented By: S. Reid Harrod
Represented By: S. Reid Harrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Webster Business Credit Corp
Represented By: Joe Ryan Solomon
Represented By: Joe Ryan Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Arkansas Development Finance Authority
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Represented By: Lance R. Miller
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Represented By: Lance R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Bradley Lumber Company
Represented By: James Henry Penick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Oasis Trading, LLC
Represented By: James Henry Penick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Economic Development Commission
Represented By: John Kooistra, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webster Business Credit Corp
Represented By: Joe Ryan Solomon
Represented By: Richard T. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkway Bank
Represented By: S. Reid Harrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Lumber Company
Represented By: James Henry Penick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis Trading, LLC
Represented By: James Henry Penick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Development Finance Authority
Represented By: Lance R. Miller
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Represented By: Heidi H. Raschke
Represented By: William Roderick Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?