Hardy v. Gorum et al

Plaintiff: Raymond Douglas Hardy
Defendant: Robert Gorum, Todd Dew, Justin Young and Kelly Blair
Case Number: 1:2011cv01033
Filed: May 10, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Cleveland
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 83 ; denying 81 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 9, 2014. (cnn)
September 10, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 74 ; Case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 10, 2014. (cnn)
September 10, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 42 granting 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Gorum, Todd Dew, Kelly Blair, Justin Young; claims against parties in official capacity are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 10, 2013. (cnn)
August 26, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 42 granting 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Gorum, Todd Dew, Kelly Blair, Justin Young; claims against parties in official capacity are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 26, 2013. (cnn)
June 28, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 27 ; Case dismissed with prejudice; 18 Motion for Summary Judgment denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 28, 2012. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy v. Gorum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gorum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Dew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Douglas Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?