Martin v. Craig et al

Plaintiff: Curtis L. Martin
Defendant: Kenny Craig, Michael Courson and Rodney E. Phillips
Case Number: 1:2012cv01057
Filed: June 7, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Ashley
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 50 Report and Recommendations; granting 40 Motion to Dismiss. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 26, 2014. (mll)
May 3, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 33 ; 23 Motion to Dismiss filed by Rodney E. Phillips; Rodeny E. Phllips terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 3, 2013. (cnn)
April 29, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; re 32 ; denying 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 29, 2013. (cnn)
April 1, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 27 ; denying 25 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 1, 2013. (cnn)
November 26, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 ; Motion 10 for Entry of Default as to defendants filed by Curtis L. Martin is denied. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 26, 2012. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Craig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Courson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?