Bell et al v. Mine Safety Appliances Company et al

Plaintiff: Vickie Bell, Phillip B. Bell, Jr. and Jonathan Bell
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company, Ruemelin Manufacturing Company, Inc., Pulmosan Safety Equipment Corporation, Clemco Industries, Inc. and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2013cv01075
Filed: October 17, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Ouachita
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2017 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 222 Motion to Quash. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 22, 2017. (mll)
August 29, 2016 208 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Jonathan Bell, Phillip B. Bell, Jr, Vickie Bell against Pulmosan Safety Equipment Corporation in the amount of $1,327,569.00. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 29, 2016. (mll)
August 3, 2016 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 200 Motion for Default Judgment; see order for specifics a separate judgment will be entered after documentation provided to the court. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 3, 2016. (cnn)
February 26, 2016 199 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Ruemelin Manufacturing Company, Inc.; granting 103 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 143 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 26, 2016. (mll)
January 25, 2016 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 130 Motion to Dismiss Mine Safety Appliances Company (dismissed with prejudice); granting 131 Motion to Strike Cross-Action of Rumelin Manufacturing Company, Inc. against Mine Safety Appliances. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 25, 2016. (cnn)
April 3, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 34 Motion to Dismiss Party. Claims against Separate Defendant Clemco Industries, Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Clemco remains a party to this action because Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company has asserted a cross-claim against Clemco. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 3, 2015. (See Order for specifics.)(mfr)
January 28, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 28, 2015. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell et al v. Mine Safety Appliances Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Bell
Represented By: Steve P Harrelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip B. Bell, Jr.
Represented By: Steve P Harrelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Bell
Represented By: Steve P Harrelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruemelin Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulmosan Safety Equipment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemco Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?