Walker et al v. Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brent A. Walker and Devan R. Walker
Defendant: Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC, Scott Wiggins and John H. Warren
Case Number: 1:2013cv01080
Filed: October 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order granting #34 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Brent A. Walker, Devan R. Walker in favor of plaintiffs and against defendants in the amount of $5047.50. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 21, 2014. (cnn)
June 16, 2014 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Brent A. Walker, Devan R. Walker. (Noland, Ross)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Leave to File to file reply; plaintiffs given 7 days to file document. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 16, 2014. (cnn)
June 4, 2014 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Response to Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Brent A. Walker, Devan R. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Brief)(Noland, Ross)
May 27, 2014 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #36 Response to Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC, John H. Warren, Scott Wiggins. (Rather, Gordon)
May 27, 2014 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #34 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC, John H. Warren, Scott Wiggins. (Rather, Gordon)
May 14, 2014 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #34 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Brent A. Walker, Devan R. Walker. (Noland, Ross)
May 14, 2014 Filing 34 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Brent A. Walker, Devan R. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Noland, Ross)
April 30, 2014 Filing 33 Letter from USDC to Columbia County Circuit Clerk (cnn)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Second Motion to Remand; Case remanded to Columbia County Circuit Court. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 30, 2014. (cnn)
April 29, 2014 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 Second MOTION to Remand filed by Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC, John H. Warren, Scott Wiggins. (Rather, Gordon)
April 18, 2014 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #29 Second MOTION to Remand by Brent A. Walker, Devan R. Walker. (Noland, Ross)
April 18, 2014 Filing 29 Second MOTION to Remand by Brent A. Walker, Devan R. Walker. (Noland, Ross)
April 7, 2014 Filing 28 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Rather, Gordon)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal; amended to be filed within 7 days. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 4, 2014. (cnn)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Reply; reply should be filed within 14 days. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 4, 2014. (cnn)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Stay scheduling order deadlines until ruling on Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 31, 2014. (cnn)
January 29, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay re #19 Initial Scheduling Order, by Brent A. Walker, Devan R. Walker. (Noland, Ross)
January 2, 2014 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal filed by Brent A. Walker, Devan R. Walker. (Noland, Ross)
December 26, 2013 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply filed by Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC, John H. Warren, Scott Wiggins. (Rather, Gordon)
December 20, 2013 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal by Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC, John H. Warren, Scott Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Amended Notice of Appeal)(Rather, Gordon)
December 20, 2013 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply by Brent A. Walker, Devan R. Walker. (Noland, Ross)
December 18, 2013 Filing 19 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held by 2/3/2014. Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 2/28/2014. Jury Trial set for the week of 12/15/2014 in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 18, 2013. (rwg)
December 16, 2013 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #17 Response to Motion to Remand by Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC, John H. Warren, Scott Wiggins. (Rather, Gordon)
December 16, 2013 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC, John H. Warren, Scott Wiggins re #13 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Rather, Gordon)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Extend time to respond to plaintiffs' motion to remand by 12/16/13. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 3, 2013. (cnn)
December 2, 2013 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Remand by Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC, John H. Warren, Scott Wiggins. (McLarty, Courtney)
November 25, 2013 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #13 MOTION to Remand by Brent A. Walker, Devan R. Walker. (Noland, Ross)
November 25, 2013 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by Brent A. Walker, Devan R. Walker. (Noland, Ross)
November 15, 2013 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC, John H. Warren, Scott Wiggins. (Rather, Gordon)
October 31, 2013 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC.(Rather, Gordon)
October 30, 2013 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Scott Wiggins served on 9/30/2013, answer due 10/21/2013. (Boyd, Michael)
October 30, 2013 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. John H. Warren served on 9/30/2013, answer due 10/21/2013. (Boyd, Michael)
October 30, 2013 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC served on 10/2/2013, answer due 10/23/2013. (Boyd, Michael)
October 30, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney C. McLarty on behalf of All Defendants. (McLarty, Courtney)
October 29, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel E. Ledbetter on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ledbetter, Samuel)
October 29, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross Noland on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Noland, Ross)
October 29, 2013 CLERK'S NOTICE in Removal Case re Service of Process directing Plaintiffs Brent A. Walker, Devan R. Walker to file affidavits of service (or copies of proof of service filed in state court) for defendant(s) who have already been served with summons and a copy of the complaint, and file proof of service in this court regarding defendant(s) to be served in the future. If service is not perfected on a defendant within 120 days after filing the complaint, a show cause order will issue and the complaint against that defendant is subject to dismissal pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m). TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (cnn)
October 29, 2013 CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC. Notice of Removal #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Courtney C. McLarty. TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (cnn)
October 29, 2013 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished (cnn)
October 29, 2013 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC, John H. Warren, Scott Wiggins, filed by Brent A. Walker, Devan R. Walker. (originally filed in state court)(cnn)
October 29, 2013 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC. (cnn)
October 29, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Columbia County Circuit, case number CV-2013-146-6. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1000466), filed by Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Gordon S. Rather, Jr.
Represented By: Courtney C. McLarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wiggins
Represented By: Gordon S. Rather, Jr.
Represented By: Courtney C. McLarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Warren
Represented By: Gordon S. Rather, Jr.
Represented By: Courtney C. McLarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent A. Walker
Represented By: Ross Noland
Represented By: Samuel E. Ledbetter
Represented By: Michael W. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devan R. Walker
Represented By: Ross Noland
Represented By: Samuel E. Ledbetter
Represented By: Michael W. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?