Chaichian v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sousan Chaichian
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Hartford Insurance Group, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company Limited, Hartford Fire and Casualty Group and SWBC Insurance Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01026
Filed: April 13, 2016
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting 40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting re 55 Report and Recommendations; motion for to leave to file third amended complaint denied; see order for specifics as to specific claims. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 13, 2017. (cnn)
January 4, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 46 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 4, 2017. (mll)
August 23, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 35 Report and Recommendations; ADOPTING 36 Report and Recommendations. Further GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 29 Motion, as set forth. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 8 Motion, as set forth. Hartford Fire and Casualty Group, Hartford Insurance Group, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Company (and its Affiliates) and Hartford Fire Insurance Company are terminated as directed. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due by 9/13/2016. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 23, 2016. (hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaichian v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sousan Chaichian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: John Alan Little, Jr.
Represented By: John A Smyth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Group
Represented By: John Alan Little, Jr.
Represented By: John A Smyth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: John Alan Little, Jr.
Represented By: John A Smyth, III
Represented By: John Alan Little, Jr.
Represented By: John A Smyth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company Limited
Represented By: John Alan Little, Jr.
Represented By: John A Smyth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire and Casualty Group
Represented By: John Alan Little, Jr.
Represented By: John A Smyth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWBC Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Gary B. Rogers
Represented By: Todd Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?