Jenkins v. Camden II Operations, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Jenkins
Defendant: Mark Thompson, Camden II Operations, LLC, Ponthie Holdings, LLC, Professional Nursing Solutions, LLC, Marybret, LLC, Ross Ponthie, Southern Administrative Services, LLC, JEJ Investments, LLC, Procare Therapy Services, LLC, Robin Looney, CarePlus Staffing Services, LLC, John Ponthie and Camden II Operations, LLC doing business as Pine Hills Health and Rehabilitation Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv01047
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Ouachita
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice with Respect to Defendant Procare Therapy Services, LLC by Procare Therapy Services, LLC. (Singleton, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration ; matter is stayed and administratively terminated pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 3, without prejudice to the right of the parties to reopen the proceedings to enforce the arbitrators decision or to petition the Court to select an alternative arbitrator from the parties proposed list. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 13, 2018. (cnn)
August 13, 2018 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Compel Joint Motion and Stipulation Motion to Compel Arbitration by Camden II Operations, LLC, CarePlus Staffing Services, LLC, JEJ Investments, LLC, Robin Looney, Marybret, LLC, John Ponthie, Ross Ponthie, Ponthie Holdings, LLC, Procare Therapy Services, LLC, Professional Nursing Solutions, LLC, Southern Administrative Services, LLC, Mark Thompson. (Leflar, Samantha)
August 9, 2018 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Compel by Sharon Jenkins. (Francis, Robert)
August 9, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Donoven on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Donoven, Katherine)
August 6, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Joinder in Motion #17 to Compel Arbitration by Procare Therapy Services, LLC. (Singleton, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/7/2018 to edit text (cnn).
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw Filing; withdrawing #14 Motion to Dismiss Party. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 2, 2018. (cnn)
July 30, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Compel Motion to Join Motion to Compel by CarePlus Staffing Services, LLC, JEJ Investments, LLC, Marybret, LLC, John Ponthie, Ross Ponthie, Ponthie Holdings, LLC, Professional Nursing Solutions, LLC, Southern Administrative Services, LLC, Mark Thompson. (Bronson, Vicki)
July 27, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by CarePlus Staffing Services, LLC, JEJ Investments, LLC, Marybret, LLC, John Ponthie, Ross Ponthie, Ponthie Holdings, LLC, Professional Nursing Solutions, LLC, Southern Administrative Services, LLC, Mark Thompson.(Bronson, Vicki)
July 27, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw #14 MOTION to Dismiss Party by CarePlus Staffing Services, LLC, JEJ Investments, LLC, Marybret, LLC, John Ponthie, Ross Ponthie, Ponthie Holdings, LLC, Professional Nursing Solutions, LLC, Southern Administrative Services, LLC, Mark Thompson. (Bronson, Vicki)
July 27, 2018 Filing 14 ***WITHDRAWN* per order #18 MOTION to Dismiss Party by CarePlus Staffing Services, LLC, JEJ Investments, LLC, Marybret, LLC, John Ponthie, Ross Ponthie, Ponthie Holdings, LLC, Professional Nursing Solutions, LLC, Southern Administrative Services, LLC, Mark Thompson. (Bronson, Vicki) Modified on 8/2/2018 (cnn).
July 26, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Compel Arbitration by Camden II Operations, LLC, Robin Looney. (Leflar, Samantha)
July 26, 2018 Filing 12 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Case by Camden II Operations, LLC, Robin Looney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Leflar, Samantha). Added MOTION to Compel Arbitration on 7/27/2018 (cnn).
July 25, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Singleton on behalf of Procare Therapy Services, LLC. (Singleton, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Camden II Operations, LLC, Robin Looney.(King, Andrew)
July 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale W. Brown, II on behalf of Camden II Operations, LLC, Robin Looney. (Brown, Dale)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Procare Therapy Services, LLC.(Singleton, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha B. Leflar on behalf of Camden II Operations, LLC, Robin Looney. (Leflar, Samantha)
July 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Dossett on behalf of Camden II Operations, LLC, Robin Looney. (Dossett, Mark)
July 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff Fletcher on behalf of Camden II Operations, LLC, Robin Looney. (Fletcher, Jeff)
July 20, 2018 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal, Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number 0861-1746259.. (King, Andrew)
July 20, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/23/2018 (cnn)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished (cnn)
July 20, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendants Camden II Operations, LLC, Robin Looney. Notice of Removal #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Mark W. Dossett Jeff Fletcher, Dale W. Brown, Samantha Leflar . (cnn)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Sharon Jenkins. (Originally filed in state court)(cnn)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by defendants (cnn)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ouachita County Circuit, case number 52CV-18-233., filed by all defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4)(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Camden II Operations, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Jenkins
Represented By: Robert William Francis
Represented By: John Hout
Represented By: Brent Lee Moss
Represented By: Brian D. Reddick
Represented By: Katherine A. Donoven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Thompson
Represented By: Vicki Bronson
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden II Operations, LLC
Represented By: Andrew King
Represented By: Samantha B. Leflar
Represented By: Jeff Fletcher
Represented By: Dale W. Brown, II
Represented By: Mark W. Dossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ponthie Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Vicki Bronson
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Nursing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Vicki Bronson
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marybret, LLC
Represented By: Vicki Bronson
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Ponthie
Represented By: Vicki Bronson
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Administrative Services, LLC
Represented By: Vicki Bronson
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEJ Investments, LLC
Represented By: Vicki Bronson
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procare Therapy Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Singleton
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Looney
Represented By: Andrew King
Represented By: Samantha B. Leflar
Represented By: Jeff Fletcher
Represented By: Dale W. Brown, II
Represented By: Mark W. Dossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CarePlus Staffing Services, LLC
Represented By: Vicki Bronson
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ponthie
Represented By: Vicki Bronson
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden II Operations, LLC doing business as Pine Hills Health and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Andrew King
Represented By: Samantha B. Leflar
Represented By: Jeff Fletcher
Represented By: Dale W. Brown, II
Represented By: Mark W. Dossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?