Cunningham v. Murphy USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lori Cunningham
Defendant: Murphy USA Inc. and Kohli Kick
Case Number: 1:2018cv01065
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated per TEXT ORDER 11 . Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 11, 2018. (cnn)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER terminating #6 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 10, 2018. (ee)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Amended Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration. The case will be sent to arbitration, by agreement of the parties, and the Clerk of Court is directed to administratively terminate the case. The parties may file a motion to reopen the case if, after arbitration proceedings have concluded, they determine that they require further relief of the Court. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 10, 2018. (ee)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Lori Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vandiver, Brian)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Talley Parker on behalf of All Defendants. (Parker, Talley)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to all Defendants. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 14, 2018. (ee)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Kohli Kick, Murphy USA Inc.. (Parker, Talley)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Lori Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vandiver, Brian)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Honorable Susan O. Hickey no longer assigned to the case. (cnn)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Kohli Kick, Murphy USA Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (lw)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Lori Cunningham. (lw)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kohli Kick, Murphy USA Inc. ( Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 2020886), filed by Lori Cunningham.(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Murphy USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy USA Inc.
Represented By: Talley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohli Kick
Represented By: Talley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Cunningham
Represented By: Brian A. Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?