Higgins v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Leslie Higgins
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 1:2018cv01077
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leslie Higgins. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Graham, David)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Office of Regional Chief Counsel for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Graham, David)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Attorney General for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Graham, David)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to US Attorney for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Graham, David)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Leslie Higgins. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Graham, David)
January 3, 2019 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Honorable Barry A. Bryant no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 26, 2018. (mll)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Fornm)(cnn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and MOTION for Service by Leslie Higgins. (cnn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Leslie Higgins. (cnn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Leslie Higgins.(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgins v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Higgins
Represented By: David C. Graham, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?