Jones v. Love, Beal & Nixon, PC et al
Plaintiff: Heather Jones and Heather Dempsey
Defendant: Love, Beal & Nixon, PC, Midland Funding, LLC and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv01003
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Love, Beal & Nixon, PC and Midland Funding, LLC answer due 3/19/2019. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 1, 2019. (cnn)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Love, Beal & Nixon, PC, Midland Funding, LLC. (Shannon, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Love, Beal & Nixon, PC answer due 3/5/2019; Midland Funding, LLC answer due 3/5/2019. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 11, 2019. (mll)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Love, Beal & Nixon, PC, Midland Funding, LLC. (Shannon, Michael)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Jones. Love, Beal & Nixon, PC served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Saks, Yaakov)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Love, Beal & Nixon, PC, Midland Funding, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Heather Jones. (cnn)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS with Jury Demand against John Doe 1-25, Love, Beal & Nixon, PC, Midland Funding, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 1000836), filed by Heather Jones.(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Love, Beal & Nixon, PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love, Beal & Nixon, PC
Represented By: Michael N. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Michael N. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Jones
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Dempsey
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?