Slaughter v. Columbia Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stephen E. Slaughter
Defendant: Columbia Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01023
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #16 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Reply to Columbia Mutual's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. (Waddell, Sam)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Reply to Columbia Mutual's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Stephen E. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply)(Steadman, Timothy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. (Waddell, Sam)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #13 MOTION to Remand by Stephen E. Slaughter. (Steadman, Timothy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by Stephen E. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Steadman, Timothy)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefan Shane Baker on behalf of Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. (Baker, Stefan)
May 23, 2019 TEXT ONLY Notice of Removal fee received via Pay.gov: $ 400.00, receipt number AARWDC-1919621. (mfr) Modified on 5/28/2019 (src).
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sam Waddell on behalf of Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. (Waddell, Sam)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss (originally filed in state court by Judge Guthrie) pursuant to amended complaint filed. (cnn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Stephen E. Slaughter. (originally filed in state court) (cnn)
May 22, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 5/24/2019 (cnn)
May 22, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Stephen E. Slaughter. Complaint (originally filed in state court) #4 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Timothy Steadman, Jerry Garner, Lloyd "Tre" Kitchens. (cnn)
May 22, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. Notice of Removal, #2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Shane Baker and Samuel Waddell. (cnn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. (originally filed in state court)(cnn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #4 Complaint against Columbia Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Stephen E. Slaughter. (originally filed in state court) Related document: #4 Complaint filed by Stephen E. Slaughter.(cnn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. (originally filed in state court) (cnn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. (originally filed in state court) (cnn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Columbia Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Stephen E. Slaughter. (originally filed in state court)(cnn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Union County Circuit, case number CV-19-73-6., filed by Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(cnn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slaughter v. Columbia Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen E. Slaughter
Represented By: John Holleman
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Represented By: Stefan Shane Baker
Represented By: Sam Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?