Smelser v. Discover Bank
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Smelser
Defendant: Discover Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv01025
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:0277
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by Discover Bank. (Jones, Justin)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint. Discover Bank answer due 7/29/2019. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 22, 2019. (rwg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint by Discover Bank. (Jones, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Discover Bank answer due 7/22/2019. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 3, 2019. (mll)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Discover Bank. (Jones, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin L. Jones on behalf of Discover Bank. (Jones, Justin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by Jeffrey Smelser. Discover Bank served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Chami, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Re-Issued as to Discover Bank and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Discover Bank for service of the following document: #2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint. (Chami, David)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by Jeffrey Smelser. Discover Bank served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Chami, David)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Discover Bank and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Discover Bank for service of the following document: #2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint. (Chami, David)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Discover Bank ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1923768), filed by Jeffrey Smelser.(Chami, David)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jeffrey Smelser. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smelser v. Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: Justin L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Smelser
Represented By: David Chami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?