Givens v. El Dorado Festivals & Events, Inc.

Plaintiff: Brian Mark Givens
Defendant: El Dorado Festivals & Events, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01026
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by El Dorado Festivals & Events, Inc.. (Jackson, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by El Dorado Festivals & Events, Inc.. (Jackson, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by El Dorado Festivals & Events, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jackson, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Mark Givens. El Dorado Festivals & Events, Inc. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Price, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to El Dorado Festivals & Events, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to El Dorado Festivals & Events, Inc., d/b/a Murphy Arts District for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Price, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against El Dorado Festivals & Events, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1928600), filed by Brian Mark Givens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2 - Right to Sue Letter)(Price, David) Modified on 6/11/2019 to delete duplicate text (cnn).
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Brian Mark Givens. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Givens v. El Dorado Festivals & Events, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Mark Givens
Represented By: David P. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Dorado Festivals & Events, Inc.
Represented By: William Stuart Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?