Miller v. Merritt et al

Case Number: 1:2019cv01027
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: El Dorado Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Eastern Arkansas. (cnn)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00343. Docket sheet received.
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer this case to the Western District of Arkansas, El Dorado Division. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/12/2019. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 6/12/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Harry Keith Miller. (llg) [Transferred from ared on 6/12/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Harry Keith Miller. (llg) [Transferred from ared on 6/12/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT by Harry Keith Miller. (llg) [Transferred from ared on 6/12/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 05/21/2019. (lmc) [Transferred from ared on 6/12/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's institutional account, until a total of $350 has been collected and forwarded to the Clerk; directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint form; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Grimes Unit and the appropriate ADC offices. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/21/2019. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 6/12/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Harry Keith Miller. (llg) [Transferred from ared on 6/12/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harry Keith Miller. (llg) [Transferred from ared on 6/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Merritt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?