Turner, Estate of v. Calhoun County Sheriff's Department
Plaintiff: James Earl Turner, Estate of
Defendant: Calhoun County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv01030
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #9 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Calhoun County Sheriff's Department: (Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2019 09:30 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey.) Motions terminated: #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Calhoun County Sheriff's Department filed by Estate of James Earl Turner. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 23, 2019. (mll)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY of Default as to Calhoun County Sheriff's Department. (cnn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Calhoun County Sheriff's Department by James Earl Turner, Estate of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 Affidavit in Support of Default)(Kitchens, Lloyd)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFAULT PROCEDURE under FRCP 55 directed to plaintiff as to default of Defendant Calhoun County Sheriff's Department. Affidavit in Support of Default due by 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Default)(cnn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Calhoun County Sheriff's Department by James Earl Turner, Estate of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Affidavit)(Kitchens, Lloyd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by James Earl Turner, Estate of. Calhoun County Sheriff's Department served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Kitchens, Lloyd)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Calhoun County Sheriff's Department and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Calhoun County Sheriff's Department for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (Kitchens, Lloyd)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Calhoun County Sheriff's Department ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1937298), filed by James Earl Turner, Estate of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kitchens, Lloyd)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by James Earl Turner, Estate of. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner, Estate of v. Calhoun County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calhoun County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Earl Turner, Estate of
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?