Smith et al v. TRW Automotive US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Herbert Wayne Smith and Kimberly Smith
Defendant: TRW Automotive US, LLC, Chrysler Motors, LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc. and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01031
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint, filed by Herbert Wayne Smith. TRW Automotive US, LLC served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Pleasant, Kristen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint, filed by Herbert Wayne Smith. Chrysler Motors, LLC served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Pleasant, Kristen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint, filed by Herbert Wayne Smith. FCA US LLC served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Pleasant, Kristen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint, filed by Herbert Wayne Smith. TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Pleasant, Kristen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Chrysler Motors, LLC, FCA US LLC, TRW Automotive US, LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to TRW Vehicle Safety Systems for service of the following document: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Pleasant, Kristen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to TRW Automotive for service of the following document: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Pleasant, Kristen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Chrysler motors for service of the following document: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Pleasant, Kristen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to FCA US for service of the following document: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Pleasant, Kristen)
July 15, 2019 Complaint filing fee paid re #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1946159.. (Pleasant, Kristen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
July 12, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/15/2019. (mll)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Herbert Wayne Smith, Kimberly Smith. (mll)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Chrysler Motors, LLC, FCA US LLC, TRW Automotive US, LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc. filed by Herbert Wayne Smith, Kimberly Smith. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C) (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. TRW Automotive US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Wayne Smith
Represented By: Kristen B. Pleasant
Represented By: Donecia Banks-Miley
Represented By: Jessica Welch Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Smith
Represented By: Kristen B. Pleasant
Represented By: Donecia Banks-Miley
Represented By: Jessica Welch Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?