Neal v. Brooks et al
Plaintiff: Mark Neal
Defendant: John Doe and Matt Brooks
Case Number: 1:2019cv01032
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 9/30/3019. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due on or before 10/25/2019. Jury Trial set for the week of 8/31/2020 in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 16, 2019. (rwg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Matt Brooks.(LaFever, Amanda)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. LaFever on behalf of Matt Brooks. (LaFever, Amanda)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Neal. Matt Brooks, in his official capacity, served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Sutter, Luther) Modified to add docket text on 7/24/2019. (mll)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Neal. Matt Brooks served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Sutter, Luther)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Two (2) Summons Issued as to Matt Brooks (Individually and Officially) and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Matt Brooks, Official Capacity for service of the following document: #4 Affidavit, #2 Complaint. (Sutter, Luther)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT filed by Mark Neal re #2 Complaint John Doe Affidavit. (Sutter, Luther)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Matt Brooks, Individually for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Sutter, Luther)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Matt Brooks, John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1949227), filed by Mark Neal.(Sutter, Luther)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Mark Neal. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Brooks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Brooks
Represented By: Amanda M. LaFever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Neal
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?