Darrough v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Stephanie Darrough
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 1:2020cv01031
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to US Attorney General for SSA for service of the following document: #3 Complaint, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, Order Directing Service,, #6 Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA. (Webb, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Gen Counsel Region 6 for SSA for service of the following document: #3 Complaint, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, Order Directing Service,, #6 Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA. (Webb, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to US Attorney Ark Western for SSA for service of the following document: #3 Complaint, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, Order Directing Service,, #6 Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA. (Webb, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 *** DISREGARD WRONG PDF ATTACHED *** THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to US AG for SSA for service of the following document: #3 Complaint, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, Order Directing Service,, #6 Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA. (Webb, Daniel) Modified on 8/14/2020 (cnn).
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 *** DISREGARD WRONG PDF ATTACHED *** THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Gen Counsel Region 6 for SSA for service of the following document: #3 Complaint, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, Order Directing Service,, #6 Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA. (Webb, Daniel) Modified on 8/14/2020 (cnn).
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 *** DISREGARD WRONG PDF ATTACHED *** THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to US Attorney Ark Western for service of the following document: #3 Complaint, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, Order Directing Service,, #6 Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA. (Webb, Daniel) Modified on 8/14/2020 (cnn).
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Stephanie Darrough. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Webb, Daniel)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 20, 2020. (cnn)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stephanie Darrough. (Webb, Daniel) Modified on 7/20/2020 to correct event type (cnn).
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Stephanie Darrough.(Webb, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form)(cnn)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Stephanie Darrough. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darrough v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Darrough
Represented By: Daniel Allen Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?