Minor v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Minor
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01036
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to be Removed from Service List by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Mathisen, Eric)
September 15, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Brodzik, James)
September 15, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Brodzik, James)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #8 Stipulation filed by Rebecca Minor, separate defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 25, 2020. (cnn)
August 25, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Mathisen, Eric)
August 25, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P. Mathisen on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Mathisen, Eric)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 9/15/2020. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 18, 2020. (cnn)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Keenan Ryan on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Ryan, Daniel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Brodzik on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Brodzik, James)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. DANIEL K. RYAN is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 17, 2020. (fcs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. JAMES M. BRODZIK is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 17, 2020. (fcs)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Williams, A.) Modified on 8/14/2020 event for extension as to answer (cnn).
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Gene Williams on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Williams, A.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney DANIEL K. RYAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2200107) by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Williams, A.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney JAMES M. BRODZIK to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2200100) by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Williams, A.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Lockheed Martin Corporation by Rebecca Minor. (Lacy, Brandon)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Rebecca Minor. Lockheed Martin Corporation served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Lacy, Brandon)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Rebecca Minor. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America, Lockheed Martin Corporation and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Life Insurance Company of North America and Lockheed Martin Corporation for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, Lockheed Martin Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2188212), filed by Rebecca Minor.(Lacy, Brandon)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Rebecca Minor. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minor v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Represented By: A. Gene Williams
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Minor
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?