Mosley v. Hydrostatic Oil Tools, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Mosley
Defendant: Billy Pharr, Devin Dew, Hydrostatic Oil Tools, Inc. and Randy Pharr
Case Number: 1:2020cv01040
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Devin Dew, Billy Pharr, Randy Pharr.(Jameson McKendree, Jennifer)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Hydrostatic Oil Tools, Inc..(Jameson McKendree, Jennifer)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer R. Jameson McKendree on behalf of All Defendants. (Jameson McKendree, Jennifer)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Boyd on behalf of Devin Dew, Hydrostatic Oil Tools, Inc., Billy Pharr, Randy Pharr. (Boyd, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Mosley. Randy Pharr served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Sanford, Josh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Mosley. Hydrostatic Oil Tools, Inc. served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Sanford, Josh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Mosley. Devin Dew served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Sanford, Josh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Mosley. Billy Pharr served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Sanford, Josh) Modified date served and answer date on 8/28/2020. (mll)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Devin Dew, Hydrostatic Oil Tools, Inc., Billy Pharr, Randy Pharr and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Hydrostatic Oil Tools, Inc., Devin Dew, Randy Pharr, Billy Pharr for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (Sanford, Josh)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2200139), filed by Mark Mosley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join -- Mark Mosley)(Sanford, Josh)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Mark Mosley. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley v. Hydrostatic Oil Tools, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Pharr
Represented By: Jennifer R. Jameson McKendree
Represented By: Michael W. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Dew
Represented By: Jennifer R. Jameson McKendree
Represented By: Michael W. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hydrostatic Oil Tools, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer R. Jameson McKendree
Represented By: Michael W. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Pharr
Represented By: Jennifer R. Jameson McKendree
Represented By: Michael W. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Mosley
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?