Curry-Fishtorn v. Norwood et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Curry-Fishtorn
Defendant: Jim Smith, David Norwood and Cameron Owens
Case Number: 1:2020cv01043
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: El Dorado Office
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Ouachita County Jail to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full. (cnn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to David Norwood, Cameron Owens, Jim Smith and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #7 Amended Complaint, #5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #11 Order Directing Service. (cnn)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE David Norwood, Cameron Owens, Jim Smith and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 9, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(cnn)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 8, 2020. (mlf)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ $350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 8, 2020. (mlf)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Alexander Curry-Fishtorn. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mll)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jim Smith, Cameron Owens, David Norwood filed by Alexander Curry-Fishtorn.(mll)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint and completed IFP be filed by 9/10/2020. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 20, 2020. (mll)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
August 19, 2020 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Arkansas Eastern. (cnn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00974. Docket sheet received.
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this case immediately to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/19/2020. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 8/19/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Alexander Curry-Fishtorn. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 8/19/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexander Curry-Fishtorn. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry-Fishtorn v. Norwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Curry-Fishtorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?