Williams v. KBP Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Calreece Williams
Defendant: KBP Investments, LLC doing business as KBP Foods doing business as Kentucky Fried Chicken, John Doe and John Doe Entities
Case Number: 1:2020cv01058
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held on or before 1/11/2021. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 1/18/2021. Jury Trial set for 1/10/2022 in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 14, 2020. (rwg)
November 4, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant KBP Investments, LLC. Answer to Complaint #5 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Edwin Lowther, Jr. (cnn)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by KBP Investments, LLC.(Whiteside, Quinten)
November 3, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2264733.. (Whiteside, Quinten)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
November 3, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/5/2020 (cnn)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Calreece Williams. (originally filed in state court)(cnn)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ouachita County Circuit, case number CV20-197., filed by KBP Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state court documents)(cnn)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by KBP Investments, LLC. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. KBP Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calreece Williams
Represented By: Bryce Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBP Investments, LLC doing business as KBP Foods doing business as Kentucky Fried Chicken
Represented By: Quinten Johnson Whiteside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?