Rice v. Fidelity Fiduciary Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Delton Rice
Defendant: Fidelity Fiduciary Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01033
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 9/30/2021. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 10/7/2021. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2022 in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 2, 2021. (rwg)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support #12 of Response to Motion to Strike or, in the Alternative, for Leave to Serve Reply Brief by Delton Rice. (Hamilton, James) Modified on 8/26/2021 to create document link (cnn).
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #10 MOTION to Strike or, in the Alternative, for Leave to Serve Reply Brief filed by Delton Rice. (Hamilton, James)
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION to Strike by Fidelity Fiduciary Company, LLC. (Hathaway, Bradley)
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike by Fidelity Fiduciary Company, LLC. (Hathaway, Bradley)
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support #8 of Response to Motion of Defendant to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Delton Rice. (Hamilton, James) Modified on 8/13/2021 to create document link (cnn).
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Delton Rice. (Hamilton, James)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Fidelity Fiduciary Company, LLC. (Hathaway, Bradley)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Fidelity Fiduciary Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hathaway, Bradley)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Fidelity Fiduciary Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hathaway, Bradley)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Fidelity Fiduciary Company, LLC, filed by Delton Rice. (originally filed in state court)(cnn)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ashley County Circuit Court, case number CV-21-76-3., filed by Fidelity Fiduciary Company, LLC.(cnn)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Fidelity Fiduciary Company, LLC. (cnn)
July 12, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2424557.. (Hathaway, Bradley)
July 12, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/14/2021 (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Fidelity Fiduciary Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delton Rice
Represented By: James A. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Fiduciary Company, LLC
Represented By: Bradley F. Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?