Giattina v. Ouachita County, Arkansas et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Giattina
Defendant: Ouachita County, Arkansas, Tiffany Kinley, Cameron Owens, Stephanie Holmes, Jualicia O'Quinn, Tristian Eiland, Kandi Valdez, Colton Wilson, Dr. Joseph Anthony Deluca, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2021cv01047
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1443
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Tristian Eiland. Tristian Eiland served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Zellmer, Edward)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Virden Mallett on behalf of Timothy Giattina. (Virden Mallett, Jessica)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the week of 3/6/2023 @ 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 18, 2021. (rwg)
November 11, 2021 Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Joseph Anthony Deluca, Tristian Eiland, Stephanie Holmes, Tiffany Kinley, Jualicia O'Quinn, Ouachita County, Arkansas, Cameron Owens, Kandi Valdez, Colton Wilson. (Jones, Jamie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) conference to be conducted on or before 11/4/2021. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 11/11/2021. Jury Trial set for 10/3/2022 El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 7, 2021. (rwg) Modified on 10/7/2021 (rwg).
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Joseph Anthony Deluca, Tristian Eiland, Stephanie Holmes, Tiffany Kinley, Jualicia O'Quinn, Ouachita County, Arkansas, Cameron Owens, Kandi Valdez, Colton Wilson.(Jones, Jamie)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Timothy Giattina. (originally filed in state court)(cnn)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ouachita County Circuit, case number 52CV21-151., filed by Tiffany Kinley, Colton Wilson, Jualicia O'Quinn, Kandi Valdez, Cameron Owens, Ouachita County, Arkansas, Tristan Eiland, Stephanie Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(cnn)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Tristan Eiland, Stephanie Holmes, Tiffany Kinley, Jualicia O'Quinn, Ouachita County, Arkansas, Cameron Owens, Kandi Valdez, Colton Wilson. (cnn)
September 27, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2466067.. (Jones, Jamie)
September 27, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 9/29/2021 (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giattina v. Ouachita County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Giattina
Represented By: Edward Zellmer
Represented By: Jessica Virden Mallett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ouachita County, Arkansas
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Kinley
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Owens
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Holmes
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jualicia O'Quinn
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristian Eiland
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Represented By: Edward Zellmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kandi Valdez
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colton Wilson
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joseph Anthony Deluca
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?