Price v. Bynum et al
Plaintiff: Steven Andrew Price
Defendant: Sergeant Bynum and Captain Mitcham
Case Number: 1:2021cv01058
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Barry A Bryant
2 Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 15 USM 285/SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Andrew Price. Sergeant Bynum and Captain Mitcham served on 12/3/2021, answers due 12/24/2021. (cnn)
January 4, 2022 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Steven Andrew Price. Objections to R&R due by 1/21/2022. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on January 4, 2022.(mll)
December 16, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Application. On December 15, 2021, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Change of Address indicating that he has now been released from custody. (ECF No. 12). When a Plaintiff is released from confinement, the policy of the Court is to require re-submission of affidavits to determine whether he should be required to pay all, or a portion of, the fees and costs of the lawsuit. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he is directed to pay the balance of the 350.00 dollar filing fee, or to resubmit an IFP application which reflects his free-world financial status within 21 days of the date of this Order. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: the Clerk is directed to send a blank IFP Application to the Plaintiff. Plaintiff is directed to submit the balance of the 350.00 dollar filing fee or complete and sign the IFP Application within 21 days. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to pay the 350.00 dollar filing fee or resubmit an IFP application by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Completed IFP due by 1/6/2022. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on December 16, 2021. (mlf)
December 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address for Steven Price. There are no documents to resend. (lgd)
December 9, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #10 Response to Motion by Sergeant Bynum, Captain Mitcham. (Thomas, JaNan)
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sergeant Bynum, Captain Mitcham. (Thomas, JaNan)
December 9, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) with Jury Demand by Sergeant Bynum, Captain Mitcham.(Thomas, JaNan)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Steven Andrew Price. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(cnn)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Sergeant Bynum, Captain Mitcham and USM285 Forms delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #6 Order Directing Service. (mll)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Sergeant Bynum, Captain Mitcham and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 9, 2021. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(mll)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Union County Jail to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $39.09; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full.(cnn)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 8, 2021. (cnn)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Steven Andrew Price. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(cnn)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Sergeant Bynum, Captain Mitcham, filed by Steven Andrew Price.(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Bynum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Andrew Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Bynum
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Mitcham
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?