Shocklee v. Messer et al
Plaintiff: Lance Thomas Ray Shocklee
Defendant: Jonathan Messer, Houston Bradshaw, Aaron Galbert, Captain Richard Mitcham, Casey Black, Officer Tubbs and CTC Telecoin Operations
Case Number: 1:2021cv01059
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Barry A Bryant
2 Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 11 USM285/SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lance Thomas Ray Shocklee. Houston Bradshaw, Aaron Galbert, Jonathan Messer served on 12/21/2021, answers due 1/11/2022; Richard Mitcham, Officer Tubbs served on 12/20/2021, answers due 1/10/2022. (cnn)
January 3, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #7 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand, ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #7 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Houston Bradshaw, Aaron Galbert, Jonathan Messer, Richard Mitcham, Officer Tubbs.(Owens, Jason)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Houston Bradshaw, Aaron Galbert, Jonathan Messer, Richard Mitcham, Officer Tubbs and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #7 Amended Complaint, #5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #8 Order Directing Service. (cnn)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Houston Bradshaw, Aaron Galbert, Jonathan Messer, Richard Mitcham, Officer Tubbs and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 3, 2021. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(cnn)
December 2, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) against Houston Bradshaw, Officer Tubbs, Jonathan Messer, Aaron Galbert, Richard Mitcham; Terminating Casey Black (Head Nurse UCDC) and CTC Telecoin Operations, filed by Lance Thomas Ray Shocklee. Related document: #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Lance Thomas Ray Shocklee.(cnn)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff has not clearly stated how each named Defendant violated his federal constitutional rights, and some of his claims may be frivolous. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 12/10/2021. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 19, 2021. (mlf)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Union County Jail to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $1.10; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full. (cnn)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 18, 2021. (cnn)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Lance Thomas Ray Shocklee. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(cnn)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against All Defendants, filed by Lance Thomas Ray Shocklee.(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shocklee v. Messer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Thomas Ray Shocklee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Messer
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Bradshaw
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Galbert
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Richard Mitcham
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tubbs
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTC Telecoin Operations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?