Price v. Mitcham et al
Plaintiff: James Daniel Price
Defendant: Captain Richard Mitcham, Kasey Sanford and Sergeant Ward
Case Number: 1:2021cv01060
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Barry A Bryant
2 Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by Kasey Sanford of Plaintiff's Noncompliance With Local Rule 5.5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Undeliverable Mail)(Ah Loy, Alexandra)
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) with Jury Demand by Kasey Sanford.(Ah Loy, Alexandra)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy on behalf of Kasey Sanford. (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) with Jury Demand by Richard Mitcham, Sergeant Ward.(Thomas, JaNan)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Richard Mitcham, Kasey Sanford, Sergeant Ward and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #6 Order Directing Service, #5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (cnn)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE All Defendants and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 22, 2021. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(cnn)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Union County Jail to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full.(cnn)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 19, 2021. (cnn)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by James Daniel Price. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(cnn)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) with jury demand against All Defendants, filed by James Daniel Price.(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Mitcham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Daniel Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Richard Mitcham
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasey Sanford
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Ward
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?