Ascentium Capital, LLC v. Sambo's Logging, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ascentium Capital, LLC
Defendant: Sambo's Logging, Inc. and Ronnie Lee Smith
Case Number: 1:2021cv01062
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Sambo's Logging, Inc., Ronnie Lee Smith.(cnn)
January 3, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ascentium Capital, LLC. Ronnie Lee Smith served on 12/22/2021, answer due 1/12/2022. (Fowlkes, Robert)
January 3, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ascentium Capital, LLC. Sambo's Logging, Inc. served on 12/22/2021, answer due 1/12/2022. (Fowlkes, Robert)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H. Fowlkes on behalf of Ascentium Capital, LLC. (Fowlkes, Robert)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robert Harris Fowlkes is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 21, 2021. (ljl)
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Robert Harris Fowlkes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2513084) by Ascentium Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Robert H. Fowlkes)(Smyth, John)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Sambo's Logging, Inc., Ronnie Lee Smith and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Sambo's Logging and Ronnie Smith for service of the following document: #3 Complaint,. (Smyth, John)
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Ascentium Capital, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2508479), filed by Ascentium Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EFA 2282046, #2 Exhibit B - First Amendment, #3 Exhibit C - Second Amendment, #4 Exhibit D - Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit E - BLSA 2397647, #6 Exhibit F - First BLSA 2397647 Amendment, #7 Exhibit G - Second BLSA 2397647 Amendment)(Smyth, John)
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Ascentium Capital, LLC. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ascentium Capital, LLC v. Sambo's Logging, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ascentium Capital, LLC
Represented By: John A Smyth, III
Represented By: Robert H. Fowlkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sambo's Logging, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Lee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?