Humphrey v. Franklin County, Arkansas et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv02138
Filed: September 20, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this case be, and is hereby, dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. The court retains jurisdiction to vacate this order and to reopen the action upon cause shown that settlement has not been completed and that a party wishes this court to enforce the settlement agreement specifically. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 20, 2009. (lw)
November 17, 2008 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; re 113 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Marvin J. Humphrey, and 112 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Marvin J. Humphrey. Accordingly, Plaintiff's claims of denial of medical test ing, denial of dental treatment, unclean conditions of confinement, denial of access to an attorney and to the law library, inhumane treatment, and violation of the right against self-incrimination are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. As to Plaintiff' s claim that he was denied medical treatment, the claim will proceed to a jury trial against Separate Defendants Ciampoi, Lewis and Haynes, but is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE against the remaining Defendants. Matt Kimrey; Chris Meay; Derek Nietert; Josh Ross; Dustin Bradshaw and Matt Hamilton terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 17, 2008. (lw)
October 16, 2008 112 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Marvin J. Humphrey. Objections to R&R due by 11/3/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 16, 2008. (sh)
September 18, 2008 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety and defendant Garrett Green is dismissed as a defendant in case. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 18, 2008. (rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. Franklin County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?