Thompson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 2:2006cv02021
Filed: February 7, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2007 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion for Attorney's Fees under the EAJA in the amount of $2,149.50. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on February 16, 2007. (mfr)
January 12, 2007 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
January 5, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
December 29, 2006 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jereen Thompson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fitting, Lawrence)
December 29, 2006 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jereen Thompson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Verification/Certificate of Service# 2 Affidavit)(Fitting, Lawrence)
October 16, 2006 12 JUDGMENT REVERSING and REMANDING CASE TO COMMISSIONER for further consideration pursuant to sentence four and parties have 60 days from entry of the judgment on the docket in which to apppeal. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 10/16/2006. (rw)
October 16, 2006 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 10/16/2006. (rw)
June 9, 2006 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
May 11, 2006 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Jereen Thompson, Jr. (rw)
April 18, 2006 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
April 11, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/11/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/12/2006. (mfr)
April 11, 2006 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Webb, Mark)
March 17, 2006 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint and summons, filed by Jereen Thompson, Jr. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 3/7/2006, answer due 5/8/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney General of US# 2 Commissioner of SSA# 3 U.S. Attorney)(rw )
March 1, 2006 Case no longer referred to Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Consent to Jurisdiction of U.S. Magistrate Judge entered. (mfr)
March 1, 2006 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on March 1, 2006. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; #(2) Exhibit-defendant's consent)(djm)
February 15, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner only and returned to the attorney for service (sh )
February 8, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant, Jo Anne B. Barnhart, Commissioner, Social Security Administration by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 2/8/2006. (rw )
February 8, 2006 3 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jereen Thompson, Jr. ( rw )
February 7, 2006 2 Featured Case ORDER directing clerk to provisionally file the complaint, nunc pro tunc as of 2/3/06, and Plaintiff is given until 2/21/06, to complete answers to questions in IFP application and return to the court. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on February 7, 2006. (sh )
February 7, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Plaintiff Jereen Thompson, Jr.(sh )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?