Cummins v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 2:2006cv02035
Filed: March 31, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2006 13 JUDGMENT for reasons stated in the 12 Memorandum Opinion we affirm the decision of the Commissioner and dismiss plaintiff's case with prejudice. The parties have 60 days in which to appeal. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on October 31, 2006. (mfr)
October 31, 2006 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION re affirming the decision of the ALJ and dismissing plaintiff's case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on October 31, 2006. (mfr)
July 19, 2006 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
May 31, 2006 10 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on May 31, 2006. (bak)
May 30, 2006 9 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (bak)
May 24, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/23/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 7/24/2006. (rw)
May 24, 2006 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Webb, Mark)
May 22, 2006 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Statement With Respect to Service Balfe, filed by Jess A. Cummins. (Caddell, Fred)
May 22, 2006 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Statement with Respect to Service Gonzalez, filed by Jess A. Cummins. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 4/10/2006, answer due 6/9/2006. (Caddell, Fred)
May 22, 2006 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Statement With Respect to Service Defendant, filed by Jess A. Cummins. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 3/29/2006, answer due 5/30/2006. (Caddell, Fred)
May 2, 2006 TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case Reassigned to Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
April 26, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on April 26, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(mfr)
March 31, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney for service (sh )
March 31, 2006 3 COMPLAINT filed nunc pro tunc as of March 30, 2006, against Defendant Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Plaintiff, Jess A. Cummins. (sh )
March 31, 2006 2 Featured Case ORDER 1 granting Application to proceed in forma pauperis and the clerk is directed to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of March 30, 2006, and directs that a copy of the complaint filed, along with a copy of this order be served by the plaintiff, certified mail, return receipt requested on defendants, Jo Anne B. Barnhart, Commissioner of SSA, as well as Alberto R. Gonzales, US Attorney General and Mark Webb, Assistant U.S. Attorney without prepayment of fees. Defendant is ordered to answer within (60) days from the date of service, filed by Plaintiff, Jess A. Cummins. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on March 31, 2006. (sh )
March 31, 2006 1 APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jess A. Cummins. (sh )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummins v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?