Tempur-Pedic International, Inc. v. Waste to Charity, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.
Defendant: Howard Hirsch, Eric Volovic, Waste to Charity, Inc., Broco Supply, Inc., Jack Fitzgerald, Thomas Scarello, Nelson Silva, Close Out Surplus and Savings, Inc., Ernest Peia and Action Distributors, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Broco Supply, Inc. and Close Out Surplus and Savings, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv02015
Filed: February 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting 299 Motion for Relief, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 20, 2014. (lw)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER,as set forth. Non-jury Trial reset for 2/3/2014 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 1st flr (Rm 1004) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 15, 2013. (lw)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER re 283 Motion for reduction of bond, as set forth. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 9, 2013. (lw)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting 258 Motion to Reopen Case, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 4, 2013. (lw)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting 245 Motion for Order. Tempur-Pedic and CSS are hereby directed to do a joint inventory of the Booneville Warehouse within 45 business days and report tot the court within fourteen business days the volume in units, style number, SKU and other product identifier of the donated goods. ADI is hereby directed to accommodate the Tempur-Pedic and CSS representative to make available to the joint inventory representative all of the goods where ever situated. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 17, 2010. (lw)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER denying 236 Motion to Reopen Case. This matter remains stayed pending the resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings. Separate Defendants Waste to Charity, Jack Fitzgerald and Thomas Scarcello are directed to promptly inform the Court once their respective bankruptcy proceedings are concluded. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 25, 2008. (lw)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER re 231 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy filed by Waste to Charity, Inc. and 230 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy filed by Jack Fitzgerald. This case case has been removed from the trial docket of 10/6/08, and administratively terminated without prejudice to the right of the parties to reopen the proceedings upon conclusion of the bankruptcy proceedings. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 24, 2008. (lw)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 158 , 162 and 175 Motions for Summary Judgment and denying Plaintiff's 165 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court finds that genuine issues of fac t exist as set forth. The bench trial of this matter is rescheduled for 10/6/2008; 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 1st flr (Rm 1004) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 6, 2008. (mfr) Modified on 2/6/2008 to edit docket text (mfr).
February 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Tempur-Pedic International, Inc. Show Cause Hearing under Rule 65 of the FRCvP set for 2/26/2007; 02:00 PM in Fort Smith -- 2nd flr (Rm 226) before James R. Marschewski. Further, Defendants shall preserve all materials as set forth. Further the requirement for security under Rule 65(c) is set at $200,000. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on February 16, 2007. (mfr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tempur-Pedic International, Inc. v. Waste to Charity, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Hirsch
Represented By: Rex W. Chronister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Volovic
Represented By: Rex W. Chronister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste to Charity, Inc.
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broco Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Rex W. Chronister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Scarello
Represented By: Eric M. Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Silva
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Close Out Surplus and Savings, Inc.
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Peia
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel McGillycuddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Broco Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Rex W. Chronister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Close Out Surplus and Savings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Ashley Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?