Evans v. Fitzhugh et al

Plaintiff: Donald Ray Evans
Defendant: J. Michael Fitzhugh, Claire Louise Borengasser and James Marschewski
Case Number: 2:2007cv02040
Filed: April 27, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Adopting Report and Recommendations re 13 . Plaintiff may renew his motion for leave to appeal In Forma Pauperis, with the Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. The clerk is directed to collect the $455.00 filing fee, pursuant to the terms of the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 31, 2009. (sh)
August 11, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by David Ray Evans. Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 11, 2009. (sh)
May 12, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 4 , and Plaintiff's case is dismissed. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on May 12, 2009. (sh)
April 20, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 Complaint filed by Donald Ray Evans. Objections to R&R due by 5/7/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 20, 2009. (rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Fitzhugh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Michael Fitzhugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire Louise Borengasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Marschewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?