Woods v. Napier et al

Plaintiff: Elaina Woods
Defendant: Johnny Bolinger, Greg Napier and Lou/Doug Carlson
Case Number: 2:2007cv02065
Filed: June 22, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto. That Plaintiff's Objections thereto 81 are overruled. Further that this matter is dismissed with predudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 4, 2009. (lw)
June 1, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Services. The Court will issue subpoenas for the following individuals; Cynia Walker, Gregory Napier and Johnny Bolinger. Defendants' counsel is asked to produce the necessity of this c ourt issuing a subpoena Deputy Lasiter. If counsel cannot produce Deputy Lasiter, this court should be advised by no later than 6/15/09. Further the court declines to issue a subpoena for Amanda Sowa.Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 1, 2009. (lw)
April 13, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion for Relief. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 13, 2009. (lw)
March 5, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: that the Report and Recommendation 43 is not adopted.; Amanda Sowa, Deputy R. Covey and Deputy Walker added and that plaintiff's claims against Mike Conger are dismissed. That Woods' motions to assert a claim of civil conspiracy; f or polygraph examination; for disclosure of exculpatory evidence; for disclosure of electronic surveillance; for a bill of particulars; and for an extension of time to file pre-trial motions are denied. Further it is Ordered that this mater is remanded to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski for further proceedings consistent with this Order. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 5, 2009. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(lw)
November 17, 2008 43 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Elaina Woods. Objections to R&R due by 12/5/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 17, 2008. (lw)
September 30, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that the Report and Recommendations 33 is adopted in all respects except with insofar as it treats of Woods' claim against Mike Conger. That plaintiff's objections to R&R are sustained insofar as they relate to her claims that she was pepper sprayed while incarcerated at the Sebastian County Adult Detention Center, and overruled in all other respects. And granting 18 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Gregory Napier and Johnny Bolinger that Woods' claims against thes e defendants are dismissed with prejudice, that plaintiff's claim against Lou Doe is also dismissed with prejudice. Further denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mike Conger and this matter is remanded to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings on Woods' claim against this defendant consistent with this Order. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 30, 2008. (lw)
September 3, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Johnny Bolinger, Greg Napier, Lou/Doug Carlson, 24 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mike Conger, 1 and the Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Elaina Woods. Objections to R&R due by 9/22/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 3, 2008. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Napier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Napier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou/Doug Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaina Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?