Chenowith v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Beverly D. Chenowith
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2008cv02019
Filed: March 12, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the Magistrate's 12 Report and Recommendations in toto and awarding plaintiff's attorney fees in the amount of $2,776.26. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 23, 2009. (rw)
March 24, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Reversing and Remanding this case to the Commissioner for further consideration, and ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 7 . Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 24, 2009. (sh)
March 4, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Beverly D. Chenowith. Objections to R&R due by 3/23/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 4, 2009. (rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chenowith v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly D. Chenowith
Represented By: Iva Nell Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?