Ritchie v. Crawford County Detention Center

Plaintiff: Rex Lee Ritchie
Defendant: Mike Allen, Jeff Marvin, Waterdown, Irwin, Alison, Chris and Langley
Case Number: 2:2008cv02038
Filed: May 9, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety. Further granting 48 Motion to Dismiss filed by Rex Lee Ritchie; and Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 23, 2009. (lw)
September 1, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rex Lee Ritchie. Objections to R&R due by 9/21/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 1, 2009. (lw)
August 12, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining to adopt 39 Report and Recommendations; granting 41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and C. Burt Newell is substituted for Jacob M. Hargraves as counsel for Defendants. Plaintiff is advised that he must timely respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and he will receive a questionnaire from the Court to assist him in his response. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 12, 2009. (lw)
June 18, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Rex Lee Ritchie. Objections to R&R due by 7/6/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 18, 2009. (lw)
September 25, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Directing defendants to file motion for summary judgment on or before 11/24/08. Plaintiff is directed not to respond to the motion for summary judgment until so ordered by the court. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 25, 2008. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ritchie v. Crawford County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Lee Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Marvin
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterdown
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Langley
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?