Greene v. Beaumont et al
Plaintiff: Michael Don Greene
Defendant: Kimberly Beaumont and Kevin Beaumont
Case Number: 2:2008cv02048
Filed: May 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 226 JUDGMENT re 225 Memorandum Opinion and Order, Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice, and Plaintiff's motions for default judgment, docs. 184, 194-98, 202, 204-08 are denied. The parties have thirty days from entry of this judgment on the docket in which to appeal. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 21, 2011. (sh)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER denying as moot 179 Motion for Default Judgment and 183 Motion for Default Judgment; denying without prejudice 211 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena to Plaintiff's right to re-file his motion with the appropriate information. 193 is granted, and the clerk's default 181 is hereby rescinded and set aside. The clerk is directed to file 193 as answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Motions for Default Judgment (docs. 202, 204-208) will be considered at trial. The trial remains set for 2/15/2011 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 31, 2011. (lw)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting 200 Motion to Dismiss Party. Plaintiff's claims against Party Eugene Kock and Traweco SPRL are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 4, 2011. (lw)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER denying 171 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and adopting Report and Recommendations in toto 175 . Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 19, 2010. (sh)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety 166 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, Plaintiff's 157 Motion to file an Amended Complaint is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 9, 2010. (lw)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting 160 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice against Jarai & Scheer Corporation and Thomas Scheer. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 10, 2010. (lw)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER; granting 149 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Attorney Carey Brian Meadors shall be allowed to withdraw as counsel for both Kimberly and Kevin Beaumont; denying as moot Plaintiff's 117 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Further CANCELING hearing set for 5/7/10. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 20, 2010. (lw)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denying 97 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 109 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 124 Motion for sanctions; adopting Report and Recommendations re 129 Report and Recommendations.; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re 133 Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 143 Motion for Leave to supplement. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on April 15, 2010. (rw)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER re 134 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy filed by Kevin Beaumont. This action is therefore subject to an automatic stray against Separate Defendant Kevin Beaumont under 11 U.S.C. 362 pending the outcome of the bankruptcy proceeding. The case will proceed against Separate Defendants Kimberly Beaumont and Jarai & Scheer Corporation and Thomas Scheer and remains set for a bench trial during the week of 10/12/10. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 15, 2010. (lw)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 96 Motion to Continue and 106 Motion to Continue( Discovery deadline extended to 7/12/2010, Dispositive Motions deadline extended to 8/12/2010, Bench Trial set for week of 10/12/2010, 9:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 1st flr (Rm 1004) befo re Honorable Robert T. Dawson.)The Plaintiff is granted an extension through 2/9/10 to respond to the currently pending motions for summary judgment. Further the Beaumonts' 103 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED at MOOT without prejudice to their right to renew it at a later date. Finally, the order 93 ordering the issuance of a writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum, is hereby set aside and held for naught. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 14, 2009. (lw)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying as moot 79 Motion to Compel; and denying as moot 80 Motion to Compel. Should the Plaintiff be dissatisfied with the Defendants responses he should file another motion to compel with the court stating the specific responses that are inadequate. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 19, 2009. (lw)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 40 Motion for Services and DIRECTING SERVICE on Jarai & Scheer Corporation and granting 20 days to answer; denying as moot 41 Motion for Entry of Default and Motion for Default Judgment; denying 43 Motion to Stay; denying 45 Motion and Notice for an Injunction to Freeze Defendants Beaumonts' Assets, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on May 20, 2009. (lw)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Services as set forth. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 20, 2009. (lw)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Take Judicial Notice of Facts. The motion is denied as to Plaintiff's request for the Court to take judicial notice of certain facts. The motion is granted as to Plaintiff's request to join additional parties. Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days to file an amended complaint adding Thomas Scheer and J&S as defendants. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 19, 2008. (lw)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Kevin Beaumont, Kimberly Beaumont as set forth. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 5, 2008. (lw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Beaumont et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Don Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Beaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Beaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?