Davis v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Michael E. Davis
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2008cv02051
Filed: May 23, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 and granting Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees, and awarding fees in the amount of $2429.29. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 16, 2009. (sh)
October 27, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Michael E. Davis. Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 27, 2009. (rw)
July 31, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT REVERSING AND REMANDING CASE TO COMMISSIONER for further consideration pursuant to sentence four and, ADOPTING 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 31, 2009. (rw)
July 13, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Michael E. Davis. Objections to R&R due by 7/30/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 13, 2009. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Davis
Represented By: Lawrence W Fitting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?