Jones v. Allan et al

Plaintiff: Bobby - Jones
Defendant: Mike Allen, Jeff Marvin, Cupp and Crawford County Detention Center
Case Number: 2:2008cv02054
Filed: June 4, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, 26 . Accordingly, Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, for failure to prosecute and to obey the orders of this Court. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 26, 2009. (sh)
August 3, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Bobby - Jones. Objections to R&R due by 8/20/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 3, 2009. (sh)
June 22, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cupp, Nick Taylor, Jeff Marvin, Mike Allen. Bobby Jones is hereby directed to complete, sign and return the attached response to the defendants' motion for summary judgment on or before July 24, 2009. Plaintiff's failure to respond within the required period of time may subject this matter to dismissal for failure to comply with a court order. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 22, 2009. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Allan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby - Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?