Ritchie et al v. Cupp et al

Plaintiff: Rex Lee Ritchie, Billy Nelson and James E Kirby
Defendant: Cupp, Jeff Marvin and Mike Allen
Case Number: 2:2008cv02066
Filed: June 26, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto. It is further ordered that for reasons stated in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, plaintiff's Complaint is hereby dismissed. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 20, 2009. (lw)
April 20, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by James E Kirby, Rex Lee Ritchie, Billy Nelson. Objections to R&R due by 5/7/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 20, 2009. (sh)
October 7, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS is adopted in all other respects and the claims of plaintiff Billy Nelson and James Kirby are hereby dismissed on the grounds that they have failed to prosecute their claims and comply with an order of the court. Plaintiff Ritchie's claims are hereby referred back to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 7, 2008. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(sh) Modified on 10/8/2008 to edit text (rw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ritchie et al v. Cupp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Lee Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?