Blankenship v. USA Truck, Inc.

Plaintiff: William Blankenship, Jr.
Defendant: USA Truck, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv02074
Filed: July 8, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2012 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 109 re Motion to Alter Judgment and Alternative Motion for Reconsideration of the Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 9, 2012. (sh)
December 13, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants Motion to Alter Judgment and Motion for Attorneys Fees 94 . Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 13, 2011. (sh)
October 13, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Plaintiff takes nothing on his Complaint and the matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All parties to bear their respective costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 13, 2011. (lw)
October 4, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 82 Motion for Reconsideration re 82 . This case remains set for a jury trial beginning October 11, 2011. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 4, 2011. (sh) Modified on 10/4/2011 to add text. (sh).
July 15, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER denying 47 Blankenship's Motion in Limine and Protective Order; denying 49 USA's Motion to Exclude the testimony of George Byram and granting in part and denying in part 51 , as set out by the Court in the remainder of this Order. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on July 15, 2011. (sh)
March 5, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting USA Truck, Inc.'s 7 Motion to Dismiss Case and plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 5, 2009. (rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blankenship v. USA Truck, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Blankenship, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth Stephen Hixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Truck, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?