Brown v. State of Arkansas

Plaintiff: Ronald Fay Brown
Defendant: State of Arkansas, Fort Smith, City of, Sebastian County, Corporal Hicks, Craig Manus, Det. Samson and Leroy Brownlee
Case Number: 2:2008cv02102
Filed: September 19, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and granting 52 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 29, 2010. (lw)
February 17, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations 47 in its entirety; and further granting 29 Motion to Dismiss. Detective Sampson is dismissed as a Defendant in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 17, 2010. (lw)
January 28, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion for Restraining Order ; denying 35 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; denying 37 Motion to Obtain Document ; denying 39 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint, and further denying 40 Motion to Withdraw Charges. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 28, 2010. (lw)
June 25, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re 24 Order to Show Cause, the court believes Samson should be allowed to file an answer out of time in this case. Accordingly Samson is given until 7/6/09 to answer 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Ronald Fay Brown. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 25, 2009. (lw)
June 4, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 14 and plaintiff's claims against Craig Manus, Sebastian County, State of Arkansas, Leroy Brownlee and Fort Smith, City of are dismissed on the grounds the claims are frivolous, seek damages from immune defendants, and fail to state claims upon which relief can be granted; further plaintiff's claims against Corporal Hicks and Detective Samson remain. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on June 4, 2009. (rw)
March 27, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Ronald Fay Brown. Objections to R&R due by 4/13/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 27, 2009. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. State of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Fay Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Smith, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebastian County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Manus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Brownlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?