Philpott v. Grisim

Plaintiff: Robert S. Philpott
Defendant: Officer Grisim
Case Number: 2:2008cv02135
Filed: December 8, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety. Further dismissing without prejudice the plaintiff's complaint, for failure to prosecute and to obey the orders of this Court. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on June 11, 2009. (lw)
May 21, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Robert S. Philpott. Objections to R&R due by 6/8/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 21, 2009. (lw)
April 1, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That the plaintiff complete and sign the attached addendum to his complaint, and return the same to the court by 4/20/09. Plaintiff is advised that should he fail to return the completed and executed addendum by 4/20/09, his complaint may be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute and/or failure to obey an order by the court. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 1, 2009. (lw)
December 8, 2008 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk to file Plaintiff's complaint, that Plaintiff failed to submit with his complaint an IFP application and therefore the clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a blank IFP application. The Plaintiff is given until 12/29/ 08 to either complete, sign, and return the application to this court for review and filing or pay the $350.00 filing fee. If the Plaintiff fails to return the completed IFP application or pay the $350.00 filing fee by 12/29/08, the complaint will become subject to summary dismissal for failure to obey an order of the court. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 8, 2008. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpott v. Grisim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Philpott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Grisim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?