Wilson v. Alma, City of et al

Plaintiff: Vaughn Damon Wilson
Defendant: Alma, City of, Alma City Court and State of Arkansas
Case Number: 2:2009cv02025
Filed: March 19, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1983 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 27, 2009. (lw)
May 21, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations in toto, and plaintiff's Objections 9 thereto are overruled. Further the plaintiff is ordered to pay the filing fee for this case within ten days of the date of this Order, failing which his case will be dismissed. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 21, 2009. (lw)
April 30, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 5/18/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 30, 2009. (lw)
March 19, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 19, 2009. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Alma, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn Damon Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma City Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?