Bare v. NPC International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Toni Y Bare
Defendant: NPC International, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv02092
Filed: July 23, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons set out in this Order, Separate Defendants Vereecke's and Titsworth's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as to all Title VII claims, the ACRA claims for disparate treatment and sexual harassment claims, and the Arkansas common law claims for wrongful termination. These claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as to the ACRA retaliation claims brought under Ark. Code Ann. 16-23-108(a). Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on April 16, 2010. (lw)
February 12, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion for Default Judgment;and granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Stephanie Titsworth and Jason Vereecke are directed to file their response to Plaintiff's Amended complaint by 3/2/2010. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 12, 2010. (lw)
December 14, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss as set forth. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 14, 2009. (lw)
October 28, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Partial Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has failed to meet this burden, and her race discrimination claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Plaintiff's claim for intentional infliction of emotional distress is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Further the Court hereby grants Plaintiff ten(10) days to amend her Complaint. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 28, 2009. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bare v. NPC International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Y Bare
Represented By: Joseph F. Gilker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NPC International, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?