Barnett v. Atkinson, et al

Plaintiff: Matthew W. Barnett
Defendant: Rachel J. Sims, Frank Atkinson and Gayla Jackson
Case Number: 2:2009cv02158
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety as to 27 Report and Recommendations, denying as moot 23 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Frank Atkinson. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to obey the orders of this Court. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 19, 2010. (lw)
October 28, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), filed by Matthew W. Barnett. Objections to R&R due by 11/15/2010. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 28, 2010. (lw)
March 10, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations in its entirety. Accordingly. Plaintiff's property claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as Plaintiff may pursue post-deprivation remedy in state court, and Separate Defendants Lieutenant Gayla Jackson and R achel J. Sims are DISMISSED as Defendants in this matter. Plaintiff's claim that he was denied access to the Courts will proceed against the remaining defendant, Sheriff Frank Atkinson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 10, 2010. (lw)
February 12, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), filed by Matthew W. Barnett. Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2010. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 12, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. Atkinson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew W. Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel J. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayla Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?