Lapach et al v. Reynolds et al

Plaintiff: Darrell Wayne Lapach and John Michael Overbey
Defendant: Brandon Reynolds, Rick Perteson and Jerry Dorty
Case Number: 2:2010cv02003
Filed: January 5, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss Case and (CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE), and adopting Report and Recommendations in its entirety, re 15 . ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on April 28, 2010. (sh)
January 7, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and DIRECTING SERVICE on Rick Perteson, Brandon Reynolds, Jerry Dorty and granting 21 days to answer; Granting IFP, directing Clerk to assess filing fee and collect funds from Prison Account of Darrell Wayne Lapatch. Further directing the clerk to remove John Michael Overbey as a Plaintiff at this time. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 7, 2010. (lw)
January 4, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to immediately transfer plaintiff's entire case file to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/4/10. (bkp) [Transferred from ared on 1/5/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lapach et al v. Reynolds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Wayne Lapach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Michael Overbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Perteson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Dorty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?