Phillips v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Argie Alford Phillips
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2010cv02007
Filed: January 6, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in toto the Magistrate's 25 Report and Recommendations and awarding plaintiff's attorney fees in the amount of $9,992.25. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on May 8, 2012. (rw)
February 2, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT as set forth in the 19 Memorandum Opinion reversing decision of the Commissioner and remanding case for further proceedings consistent with the opinion of the Eighth Circuit Court Appeals. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 2, 2012. (rw)
January 7, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety and dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 7, 2011. (rw)
December 14, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 12/31/2010. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 14, 2010. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argie Alford Phillips
Represented By: Davis Duty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?