Detweiler v. Sebastian County Detention Center

Plaintiff: Travis Detweiler
Defendant: Sebastian County Detention Center
Case Number: 2:2010cv02027
Filed: February 22, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 48 in it's entirety and granting 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nurse Laura, and Dr. Tinsman, Frank Atkinson. Further this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on March 17, 2011. (lw)
June 9, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 Report and Recommendations in toto and plaintiff's claim against Sebastian County Sheriff's Office is dismissed; further matter is remanded to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 9, 2010. (rw)
June 4, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; directing clerk to re-issue a subpoena duces tecum to the Custodian of Medical Records of Sparks Regional Medical Center re 12 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Issuance of subpoena. (to be served by certified mail) Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 4, 2010. (lw)
May 27, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; directing defendants to file motion for summary judgment on or before 7/30/10. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 27, 2010. (lw)
May 7, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for issuance subpoena pursuant to rule 45 and 9 Motion for Issuance of subpoena. The clerk is directed to issue subpoena duces tecum to the Custodian of Medical Records of Sparks Regional Medical Center and Medical Records Director of the Arkansas Department of Correction, as set forth. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 7, 2010. (lw)
February 22, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Travis Detweiler. The Clerk is directed to file complaint provisionally prior to a determination regarding plaintiff's status as a pauper and service of process; and send plaintiff a set of form s to be used in filing a case under 42 U.S.C. 1983, to included a blank IFP application. The Plaintiff is given until 3/8/10 to complete, sign, and return the complaint and IFP application on the forms approved by the Court. Further is plaintiff fails to return the completed complaint and application to proceed IFP by 3/8/10, the complaint will become subject to summary dismissal for failure to obey an order of the court. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 22, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Detweiler v. Sebastian County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Detweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebastian County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?