Erdman Company et al v. Phoenix Land & Acquisition, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Erdman Company and Erdman Architecture & Engineering Company
Defendant: Phoenix Land & Acquisition, LLC, Phoenix Health, LLC, Benefit Bank, Arvest Bank, First National Bank of Fort Smith, Nauc Properties, LLC and Harris Company of Fort Smith, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv02045
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2013 404 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER DISCHARGING THE BOND TO RELEASE CONTRACTOR'S LIEN. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 4, 2013. (lw)
July 29, 2013 365 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 362 Motion to Supplement, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 29, 2013. (lw)
July 24, 2013 347 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 273 Motion to Bifurcate, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 24, 2013. (lw)
July 18, 2013 315 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 170 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and denying 185 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 18, 2013. (lw)
July 17, 2013 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 179 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 17, 2013. (lw)
February 25, 2013 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 186 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 25, 2013. (lw)
December 17, 2012 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 210 Motion to Dismiss. Otis's Crossclaim against Long's Drilling Service, Inc is therefore dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 17, 2012. (lw)
September 4, 2012 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and denying as moot 120 Supplemental Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 4, 2012. (lw)
November 14, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. Further, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiffs' claims against Separate Defendants First National Bank of Fort Smith, Harris Company of Fort Smith, Inc., Nauc Properties, LLC, Arvest Bank and Benefit Bank are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 14, 2011. (lw)
August 20, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion to Stay. It is therefore ordered that this case is administratively terminated, subject to being reopened on motion of any party when the mandate of the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals is received. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 20, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erdman Company et al v. Phoenix Land & Acquisition, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erdman Company
Represented By: Russell C. Atchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erdman Architecture & Engineering Company
Represented By: Russell C. Atchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Land & Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefit Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvest Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Fort Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nauc Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris Company of Fort Smith, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?